Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Barron, Charles, Chisholm, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain balloting and nomination process to select the names of certain candidates to submit to the Governor to be members of the State Board of Dental Examiners; requiring the Board, within a certain period of time, to notify certain practicing licensees and professional organizations of a vacancy on the Board, provide certain information, solicit certain nominations for the vacancy, and forward certain nominations and petitions to the Governor; and authorizing the Governor to fill a vacancy on the Board in a certain manner.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Members
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Members
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM