Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Clark, Jacobs, Lafferty, Mautz, McKay, Otto, Sample-Hughes, and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain list of plants considered to be noxious weeds in the State; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to adopt regulations to establish a list of plants considered to be noxious weeds in the State; altering a certain condition under which the Secretary may designate as a noxious weed certain plant species; specifying that certain criminal penalties apply to certain violations; requiring certain administrative penalties to be distributed to a special fund used only for the control and eradication of a noxious weed; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-3)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-3) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text - Chapter - Weed Control - Noxious Weeds - Regulations and Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101 through 12-103, 9-401, 9-402, 9-405, 9-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM