Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Rosenberg, and McMillan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to immediately notify the Criminal Justice Information System (CJIS) Central Repository if the court makes a specified finding that the person is a danger to self or to the person or property of another; requiring a court to immediately notify CJIS if the court appoints a guardian of the property or a guardian of the person of a disabled person; requiring a specified facility or Veterans' Administration hospital to submit a specified report of a voluntarily or involuntarily committed individual to CJIS; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-230, 3-106, 3-112 )
(   13-201, 13-705 )
(   10-611, 10-616.1 )
(   5-107, 5-114, 5-118, 5-133, 5-133.1, 5-134, 5-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM