Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsored by
Delegate McMillan
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a municipality that is organized under Article XI-E of the Maryland Constitution to create a parking authority as a body politic and corporate as provided under the Parking Authorities Act; authorizing a municipality to authorize an authority to take specified actions; requiring a municipality to determine specified matters by local law in connection with the authorization, issuance, sale, delivery, and payment of specified revenue bonds as authorized under the Parking Authorities Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 4/06/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264234/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 18-101, 18-103 through 18-109, 18-110, 18-111, 18-112, 18-113 through 18-115, 18-116 through 18-118, 18-119 through 18-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM