Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Marijuana - Smoking or Consuming in a Vehicle or Vessel - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Arentz, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Flanagan, Kipke, Kittleman, McKay, W. Miller, Parrott, Rose, Szeliga, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from smoking or otherwise consuming marijuana while operating or attempting to operate a vessel; prohibiting a driver of a motor vehicle from smoking or otherwise consuming marijuana in the motor vehicle on a highway; prohibiting a passenger of a motor vehicle on a highway from smoking marijuana in a passenger area of the motor vehicle or consuming marijuana in an area of the motor vehicle that is readily accessible to the driver of the motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-903.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM