Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm Safety
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Rosenberg, and McMillan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified mental health professionals under specified circumstances to report to the Director of Mental Hygiene specified information about an individual that the mental health professional is currently treating; requiring the Director to report specified information to the Secretary of State Police under specified circumstances; limiting the use of specified information to specified firearms-related purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2013 2/25/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM