Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Business Incubators
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Buckel, Fennell, Hettleman, Hixson, Kaiser, Platt, Shoemaker, Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility criteria for credits under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit to include persons who establish or expand a business facility that, for specified business incubators, creates at least 25 qualified positions at the facility under specified circumstances; requiring, in order to be certified as a qualified business entity for specified credits, a specified business incubator to submit specified information to the Secretary of Business and Economic Development; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401, 6-402, 6-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM