Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Fees and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Carter, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the annual fee required to be paid to the Department of the Environment for specified affected properties from $30 to $75; increasing the processing fee required to be submitted with a report that a rental dwelling unit is lead free from $10 to $75; requiring the Department to use the additional revenue from the increase in fees for a specified purpose; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly, on or before October 1 each year, on the implementation of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1149
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM