Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Atterbeary, and Luedtke
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling a battery operated smoke alarm in the State for a certain purpose on or after October 1, 2018, unless the smoke alarm is a sealed, tamper resistant unit incorporating a silence/hush button and using one or more long-life batteries; and defining the term "long-life battery".
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {710119/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {710119/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (120-13) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-101, 9-104, 9-106, 9-106.1, 9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM