Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Glass, Kittleman, McComas, A. Miller, Moon, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that, if a complaint filed with a Department of Juvenile Services intake officer alleges that a child violated specified laws relating to prostitution, the intake officer shall refuse authorization to file a delinquency petition with the juvenile court, shall immediately refer the child to a program that provides services for victims of human trafficking, may authorize shelter care, and, under specified circumstances, shall notify the local department of social services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM