Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Beitzel, Buckel, McComas, Miele, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which an equity court may grant visitation rights to a grandparent of a child.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1032
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0421 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM