Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barve, Cardin, Feldman, Frick, Guzzone, Ivey, Luedtke, A. Miller, Olszewski, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption for specified counties from hotel rental taxes and transient occupancy taxes for the sale of a right to occupy a room or lodgings as a transient guest at specified facilities or campuses; authorizing taxpayers to claim a refund for taxes paid after June 30, 2010, on transactions that would have been exempt under the Act; applying the Act to taxes imposed after June 30, 2010; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1-102 )
(   20.400 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM