Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $1 to $2 the amount of a specified credit against the State income tax for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0694
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415865/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {415865/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM