Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources
Sponsored by
Delegates Murphy, Arora, Kaiser, George, Ivey, A. Miller, Serafini, Walker, A. Washington, Cardin, Afzali, Barve, Luedtke, Dwyer, Myers, Stukes, Frick, Howard, Hixson, F. Turner, Harper, and McDermott
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit for alternate power sources at retail service stations; establishing when the tax credit may be granted; establishing that the tax credit shall be equal to no more than the lesser of 100% of the value of the alternate power source or $20,000; defining "alternate power source" and "retail service station"; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735268/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {395160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {735268/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {395160/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM