Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Massage Therapy - Authority to Practice
Sponsored by
Delegate Hubbard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual to be registered by the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners before the individual may practice massage therapy in a specified setting; altering the number of hours and content of specified education an applicant for a license to practice massage therapy must complete to qualify for a license; repealing a specified provision of law that prohibits an individual who is registered to practice non-therapeutic massage from practicing in specified offices, hospitals, or facilities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-5A-01, 3-5A-04, 3-5A-06, 3-5A-08, 3-5A-09 through 3-5A-16, 3-5A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM