Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Property Damage Caused by Tree
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Tarlau, Jalisi, Lam, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a land owner is liable for damages for personal injury or property damage on adjoining residential property caused by a defect in the condition of a tree on the land owner's land under specified circumstances; requiring a homeowner's insurance policy issued or renewed on or after October 1, 2016, for property located in or adjacent to a residential area to include coverage for potential liability under the Act; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM