Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Rosenberg, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited may appeal the decision; providing that appeals from a certain decision by the Secretary or the Secretary's designee may be made to the Handgun Permit Review Board; requiring the Board to review a certain record and hold a certain hearing; providing that an appeal of the Board's decision may be made to the Office of Administrative Hearings within 30 days after the decision is issued; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0741
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-51)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-31)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-51) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {868774/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (98-31) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-302, 5-311, 5-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM