Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to Privilege
Sponsored by
Delegate Simmons
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception to the privilege of communications of a patient or client if the disclosure is necessary to prove a charge in a specified criminal proceeding against the patient, former patient, client, or former client; creating an exception to the privilege of communications of a patient or client if the disclosure is necessary to establish a claim on behalf of a specified health care professional in a civil proceeding against the patient, former patient, client, or former client; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {452511/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {413828/4 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {452511/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {413828/4 Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 50
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109, 9-109.1, 9-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM