Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Fraser-Hidalgo, Barkley, Carr, Cassilly, Frick, Frush, Hixson, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Miele, A. Miller, Morhaim, Reznik, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a specified energy storage portfolio standard in the State; requiring specified electricity suppliers to comply with the energy storage portfolio standard by specified dates; requiring specified storage capacity to be sufficient to provide electricity at a specified capacity for a specified period; providing that specified energy storage devices may be used to comply with the energy storage portfolio standard, with specified exceptions; providing for the creation and use of energy storage credits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-801 through 7-808 )
(   9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM