Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Executive and County Council of Baltimore County to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from any charge or fee to participate in an amateur recreational sports event or league administered by a nonprofit entity; prohibiting in Baltimore County the imposition of the admissions and amusement tax for certain gross receipts from a charge or fee to participate in an amateur recreational sports event or league that was collected before July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {385061/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore County - Amateur Sports League Fees
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {385061/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules 57
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM