Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Anne Arundel County shall be specified amounts for specified calendar years; repealing a provision of law that requires a specified salary increase; providing that the State's Attorney may set specified salaries and compensation subject to the approval of the county council; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent State's attorney etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0639
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1022 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {190111/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM