Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Repository Program - Repository Inventory Requirement - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Buckel, Impallaria, and McConkey
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a repository that participates in the Prescription Drug Repository Program to maintain a separate inventory of donated prescription drugs and medical supplies that the repository intends to dispense under a specified provision of law, instead of a separate inventory of all donated prescription drugs.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601, 15-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM