Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure - Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Hucker, Carr, Conaway, Frush, Hubbard, A. Kelly, S. Robinson, Stein, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified funding source for the Maryland Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund and the Maryland Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund; establishing the Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure Trust Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Maryland Water Quality Financing Administration in the Department of the Environment to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605, 9-1605.1, 9-1605.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM