Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Lam, Beidle, Carr, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, Korman, Moon, Morales, and Platt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified owner of cattle, swine, or poultry from administering or authorizing an agent to administer specified antimicrobial drugs in cattle, swine, or poultry without a prescription or veterinary feed directive issued by a licensed veterinarian in accordance with specified conditions; requiring a veterinarian who issues a veterinary feed directive to submit to the Department of Agriculture specified information in a specified manner; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM