Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Krebs, Angel, Barron, Hill, Kelly, Oaks, Pendergrass, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to provide that a general license to practice dental hygiene authorizes the licensee to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in a specified facility with a population that lacks direct access to dental care, rather than only in a long-term care facility; altering the requirements that a dental hygienist is required to meet before being authorized to practice dental hygiene under general supervision of a licensed dentist in a specified facility; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0538
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM