Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Community Development Administration from requiring the use of long-term tax-exempt bonds to qualify for Rental Housing Works loans or otherwise conditioning the award of financial assistance under an affordable housing program administered by the Administration on the use of any other Administration resource.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:21 PM
Click to return on the top page