Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant
Sponsored by
Delegate Bohanan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Trustees of St. Mary's College of Maryland from increasing the undergraduate resident student tuition rates in the fall of 2013 and the fall of 2014; requiring the Governor to appropriate a specified amount to St. Mary's College of Maryland from a specified fund in specified fiscal years; requiring a specified calculation for a specified fiscal year to include specified funds; establishing a DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0828
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604761/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {604761/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-410, 14-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM