Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Atterbeary, Cluster, Conaway, Kittleman, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, Moon, Morhaim, Parrott, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Sanchez, Sydnor, Vallario, Vogt, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0731
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 36
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:41 PM