Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, R. Lewis, and McCray
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying certain requirements for a complaint for repossession for failure to pay rent in Baltimore City; altering the date from the fifth to the fourteenth day after filing of a certain complaint when a certain individual may be ordered to appear in court in a certain repossession action in Baltimore City; requiring a court to reschedule a certain hearing and a sheriff to refund certain fees if the sheriff is unable to serve a certain summons in Baltimore City under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page