Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, A. Miller, S. Robinson, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a manufacturer to make specified payments to dealers relating to benefits, incentives, and rebates; prohibiting manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches from taking specified coercive, punitive, and retaliatory actions against dealers; altering requirements relating to the transfer of franchises and the payment of claims made by dealers; increasing from $50,000 to $500,000 the maximum fine for specified violations committed by manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 15-207.1, 15-210, 15-211, 15-212, 15-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM