Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Hixson, and Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "agricultural land transfer tax" and defining "total rate of tax" to provide that, for purposes of specified provisions of law concerning the calculation of the agricultural land transfer tax, the tax does not include a specified surcharge; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0306
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM