Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug Tests
Sponsored by
Delegates Stocksdale, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Cluster, Elliott, Frank, George, Impallaria, Jacobs, K. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Serafini, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring individuals applying for or receiving temporary cash assistance benefits under the Family Investment Program to comply with specified eligibility requirements related to drug testing; requiring individuals applying for or receiving temporary cash assistance benefits under the Family Investment Program to pay for the cost of drug testing; providing for reimbursement of the cost of specified drug testing if the test is negative; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101 )
(   5-301, 5-308, 5-308.1, 5-312, 5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM