Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone and McHale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering and harmonizing variations of the defined term "plug-in electric drive vehicle" as that term applies to planning by a utility for the availability and reliability of electric supply, excise tax credits, and exemptions allowing the use of high occupancy vehicle lanes regardless of the number of passengers; extending the termination date for the exemption allowing the use of high occupancy vehicle lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles regardless of the number of passengers; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0600
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 13-815, 25-108 )
(   2010, 2011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM