Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to monitor effluent discharged from sewage treatment plants and evaluate whether the effluent impacts midge populations in the surrounding land and water areas; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2021 and each year thereafter.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-321.3 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:11 PM