Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS; defining "PANDAS" as Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated with Streptococcal Infections and "PANS" as Pediatric Acute-Onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome; requiring the Advisory Council to develop and update as necessary recommendations regarding diagnosis and treatment options, clinical awareness, and outreach related to PANDAS and PANS and submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3601 through 13-3605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM