Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing requirements for the holding of specified assets owned by a specified Methodist Church; and repealing provisions of law providing for the effect of the absence of a trust clause in a specified deed or other conveyance executed before a specified date.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0347
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1021 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM