Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and State Board of Social Work Examiners - Grounds for Denying Licenses and Certificates
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Dwyer, Glass, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and the State Board of Social Work Examiners from issuing a specified license or certificate to an individual who had a specified license or certificate revoked or surrendered a specified license or certificate because the individual was convicted of or pled guilty or nolo contendere to a specified felony or crime; authorizing a specified appeal if specified circumstances exist; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-509, 17-509.1, 19-311, 19-311.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM