Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Brooks, Ciliberti, Frick, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, C. Howard, Jalisi, Lam, Luedtke, Pendergrass, Sophocleus, Stein, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Program; authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to transfer up to $50,000,000 from the non-State supported fund balance to a certain quasi-endowment fund; establishing the Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Fund as a quasi-endowment fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to provide scholarships to certain low-income Maryland residents; requiring the Board to administer the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1049
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Endowed University System of Maryland Scholarship Program - Established
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-104, 12-118, 18-1001 through 18-1005, 18-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM