Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Refundable Earned Income Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Stukes, Summers, F. Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 25% to 30% the percentage of the federal earned income credit that determines the amount an individual may claim as a State income tax refund under specified circumstances; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0703
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0331 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM