Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Dwyer, Glass, McComas, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an appellate court or circuit court that contracts with a private entity for stenography services to require the entity to provide 5% of the stenography services free of charge for specified purposes to ensure access to court services by indigent clients.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM