Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Carey, McConkey, Morgan, Patterson, and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency to report specified information to the Department of State Police within 24 hours after the seizure or recovery of a firearm relating to a crime, with specified exceptions; requiring the Department, on or before January 31 of each year, to submit to the General Assembly a report and statistical analysis on all firearms relating to a crime recovered in the State during the previous calendar year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601 through 5-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM