Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain school administration to file a police report and an administrative incident report if an assault, a crime of violence, or a felony occurs at a public school and is reported to the school administration; requiring a school administration to provide certain information to a victim or parent of a victim; requiring each county board of education to adopt regulations specifying the requirements of administrative incident reports and a policy specifying the penalty for a certain violation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1175 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Reporting of Assaults, Crimes of Violence, and Felonies (Report Act of 2020)
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page