Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition on a consumer bringing a certain action or proceeding against a consumer reporting agency; altering the manner in which a consumer may place, temporarily lift, or remove a security freeze; requiring a consumer reporting agency to develop certain procedures involving the use of certain secure connections to receive and process certain requests; authorizing a consumer reporting agency to develop certain electronic methods; establishing the Nondepository Special Fund for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763798/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {763798/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {167878/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Text - Chapter - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1201, 14-1207, 14-1212.1, 14-1212.2, 14-1213 through 14-1218, 14-1215 through 14-1218, 14-1221, 14-1226, 14-1227 )
(   1-101, 11-610, 2-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM