Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Holmes, Anderton, Carr, Fennell, Ghrist, Healey, C. Howard, Jalisi, McCray, McKay, Otto, Patterson, Proctor, Sanchez, and Queen
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements relating to carbon monoxide alarms as the requirements apply to rental dwelling units; requiring specified rental dwelling units, on or after April 1, 2018, to have a specified carbon monoxide alarm installed within the dwelling outside and in the immediate vicinity of each separate specified sleeping area, and on every level of the unit, including the basement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {610212/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-7)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844137/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Delegates Holmes, Anderton, and McCray
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senators Waugh, Kagan, and Salling
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-4)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {610212/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/14/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-7) 43A
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {844137/2 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Delegates Holmes, Anderton, and McCray 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senators Waugh, Kagan, and Salling 66
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-4) 72
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 68
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-801 )
(   12-1101, 12-1102, 12-1103, 12-1104, 12-1105, 12-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM