Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Rate Effectiveness and People's Insurance Counsel Division
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Bagnall, Bartlett, Charkoudian, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Fennell, Holmes, Lehman, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain rates from taking effect without prior approval from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; altering the definition of "insurer" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the People's Insurance Counsel to include property and casualty insurers; requiring the Commissioner to collect a certain annual assessment from each property and casualty insurer; requiring the People's Insurance Counsel Division to review certain rate increases filed with the Commissioner by a property and casualty insurer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Rate Effectiveness and People's Insurance Counsel Division
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Insurance - Rate Effectiveness and People's Insurance Counsel Division
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 4:16 PM