Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Atterbeary, Beitzel, Branch, Brooks, Cullison, Ebersole, Kelly, Lam, McComas, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Pendergrass, Reilly, Turner, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain county plan to designate, on or before July 1, 2019, an appropriate agency of the county to be responsible for creating a workable plan to address the disposal of mattresses and box springs and the expansion and development of certain businesses for certain purposes; requiring the Office of Recycling within the Department of the Environment to encourage certain programs that divert mattresses and box springs from disposal in landfills and incinerators; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1702, 9-1703, 9-503, 9-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM