Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medicaid and the Maryland Children's Health Program - Home and Community-Based Providers - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Governor's proposed budget for fiscal year 2020, and for each fiscal year thereafter, include a 3.5% rate increase for certain home and community-based providers over the funding provided in the legislative appropriation for the immediately preceding fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medicaid and the Maryland Children's Health Program - Home and Community-Based Providers - Funding
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1101, 15-1102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM