Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Arikan, Bagnall, Chisholm, Krebs, Malone, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders to study certain practices and procedures at certain facilities and to make recommendations on necessary changes to improve patient treatment, training for staff, and reporting on early patient discharge; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1531 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force on the Premature Discharge of Patients With Substance Use Disorders
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM