Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Donations to Community Colleges
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Cassilly, Ghrist, Impallaria, Jalisi, Lam, McComas, McKay, Reilly, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a specified credit against the State income tax for a specified amount of donations to community colleges in the State; requiring specified taxpayers to add a specified deduction back to federal adjusted gross income to determine Maryland adjusted gross income; requiring a specified individual or a specified corporation to apply to the Maryland Higher Education Commission at least 30 days before making a specified donation to a community college; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-305, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM