Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsored by
Caroline County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint the members of the Board of Trustees of Chesapeake College from a list of at least three qualified individuals submitted to the Governor by each county that supports Chesapeake College.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0038
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0266 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM